Global patent index - EP 0998865 A2

EP 0998865 A2 2000-05-10 - Locking device for drawer slide

Title (en)

Locking device for drawer slide

Title (de)

Auszugsführung mit Verriegelung

Title (fr)

Verrouillage pour glissières de tiroir

Publication

EP 0998865 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99104244 A

Priority

DE 19849798 A

Abstract (en)

The locking mechanism has a bolt (8) which is attached rotatably inside the outer contour of the rail (13) on the carcase side. An operating element is formed as a flat slider and is mounted movably in the guide rail (11) on the drawer side. The slider has operating faces set inclined to its direction of movement to engage with the bolt. Preferred Features: The slider lies on the inner face of the drawer guide rail and has at least two continuous oblong holding recesses guiding engagement with raised parts on the inner face.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Auszugsführung mit einer korpusseitigen Führungsschiene (13), einer Mittelschiene (12) und einer einschubseitigen Führungsschiene (11), die in Bewegungsrichtung länglich, gleich lang ausgebildet sind und Endanschläge haben für die Vermeidung des Überfahrens der einen Schiene gegenüber der anderen, und mit einem ersten Verriegelungsmechanismus (18) im ausgefahrenen Zustand und einem zweiten Verriegelungsmechanismus im eingefahrenen Zustand, wobei jeder Verriegelungsmechanismus einen in seine verriegelte Position vorgespannten Riegel (8) und einen mit dem Riegel zusammenwirkenden Anschlag hat, und der Riegel (8) mit einem Betätigungselement, das sich über die Länge einer Schiene (11 - 13) erstreckt, betätigbar ist. Damit auch der Verriegelungsmechanismus innerhalb der Außenkontur der Führungsschiene angeordnet werden kann, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß der Riegel (8) des Verriegelungsmechanismus innerhalb der Außenkontur der korpusseitigen Schiene (13) drehbar angelenkt ist, daß das Betätigungselement in Form eines flachen Schiebers in der einschubseitigen Führungsschiene (11) verschieblich angeordnet ist und daß der Schieber schräg zu seiner Bewegungsrichtung angestellte Betätigungsflächen für den Eingriff mit dem Riegel aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/10; A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/10 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0032 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0059 (2013.01); A47B 2210/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19849798 A1 20000504; DE 59912978 D1 20060202; EP 0998865 A2 20000510; EP 0998865 A3 20030917; EP 0998865 B1 20051228

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912978

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI