Global Patent Index - EP 0998868 A1

EP 0998868 A1 2000-05-10 - Bundling device

Title (en)

Bundling device

Title (de)

Bündelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison

Publication

EP 0998868 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120493 A

Priority

DE 29819489 U

Abstract (en)

A fitting for linking sets of clothes hangers has a flat plastic trip with a lower lip at right angles to the strip and with holes spaced along the lip. The hooks of the clothes hangers are clipped through the holes. The upper end of the strip has an upper tag (4) in the center of the strip and with a hole (7) which positions the hook of the middle hanger of the set. The strip is bent onto the central hook to hold the strip. The strip can be fitted with a label i.e. to identify the set of clothes on the hangers clipped to the strip.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Bündelvorrichtung für Hänger mit Haken, insbesondere Kleider- oder Wäschebügel. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine Bündelvorrichtung zu schaffen, mit deren Hilfe die auf Hängern hängenden Waren während des einzelnen Aufhängens der Hänger auf eine Stange gebündelt werden können. Diese Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, daß die Bündelvorrichtung aus einem Kunststoffteil besteht, das eine Kennzeichnungslasche (2), eine an die untere Kante der Kennzeichnungslasche (2) abwinkelbar oder abgewinkelt angeformte Bündellasche (3) und eine sich im mittleren Bereich der oberen Kante der Kennzeichnungslasche (2) anschließende Klemmlasche (4) umfaßt, daß in der Längsmitte der Bündellasche (3) und in der Klemmlasche (4) Durchtrittsöffnungen (6,7) für den Haken eines Hängers angeordnet sind und daß in der Bündellasche (3) zu beiden Seiten der Durchtrittsöffnung (6) weitere Öffnungen (9) zur Aufnahme der Haken angrenzender Hänger angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/145 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819489 U1 19990218; EP 0998868 A1 20000510; EP 0998868 B1 20030312

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: W. *WILLPUTZ KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNGS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051015

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2005-10-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2004-10-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041005

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904524 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001104

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI