Global Patent Index - EP 0998871 A1

EP 0998871 A1 2000-05-10 - Telescopic suction cleaner pipe

Title (en)

Telescopic suction cleaner pipe

Title (de)

Teleskopierbares Staubsauger-Saugrohr

Title (fr)

Tuyau d'aspirateur télescopique

Publication

EP 0998871 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120504 A

Priority

DE 19850355 A

Abstract (en)

The telescopic suction hose has a plastic sealing sleeve (13) between the inner end (11) of the inner telescopic hose (10) and the inside of the outer telescopic hose (20), having a material thickness which is not greater than the play (Z) between the inner and outer telescopic hoses and provided with a sealing lip (14) spring-biased into contact with the inside wall of the outer telescopic hose. The sealing sleeve has an opening (23) receiving a retaining projection (22) projecting radially outwards from the wall of the inner telescopic hose.

Abstract (de)

Ein teleskopierbares Staubsauger-Saugrohr weist ein Innenrohr (10) und ein Außenrohr (20) und eine endseitig am inneren Ende (bei 11) des Innenrohres (10) befestigten, im Zwischenraum (Z) zwischen Innenrohr (10) und Außenrohr (20) angeordnete Dichtungshülse (13) aus Kunststoff auf. Die Materialstärke der Dichtungshülse (13) ist nicht größer als das Passungsspiel (Z) zwischen Außenrohr (20) und Innenrohr (10), wobei die Dichtungshülse (13) eine die innere Stirnfläche (11) des Innenrohres (10) axial überragende, sich eigenfedernd an der Innenmantelfläche (21) des Außenrohres (20) abstützende Dichtlippe (14) aufweist. Die Dichtungshülse (13) bildet hülsenseitige Rastmittel (23) und das Innenrohr (10) bildet rohrseitige Gegenrastmittel (22). Eine unproblematische Montageweise der Dichtungshülse wird dadurch bewerkstelligt, daß dem Innenrohr (10) als Gegenrastmittel mindestens ein in den Zwischenraum (Z) zwischen Innenrohr (10) und Außenrohr (20) hineinragender Vorsprung (22) zugeordnet ist, welcher an der Wand des Innenrohres (10) festgelegt ist. Das hülsenseitige Rastmittel ist von einer an der Innenmantelfläche (19) der Dichtungshülse (13) offenen, den Vorsprung (22) aufnehmenden, Aussparung (23) gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/244 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998871 A1 20000510; EP 0998871 B1 20040804; AT 272352 T 20040815; CZ 295210 B6 20050615; CZ 9903691 A3 20001213; DE 19850355 A1 20000511; DE 59910120 D1 20040909; DK 0998871 T3 20041115; EE 03946 B1 20030217; EE 9900458 A 20000615; ES 2226260 T3 20050316; HK 1028172 A1 20050225; HK 1038487 A1 20050225; HU 9903847 A2 20000928; HU 9903847 A3 20020528; HU 9903847 D0 19991228; JP 2000185001 A 20000704; JP 4048261 B2 20080220; KR 100452577 B1 20041014; KR 20000035094 A 20000626; NO 995321 A 20000503; NO 995321 D0 19991101; PL 191252 B1 20060428; PL 336338 A1 20000508; RU 2161900 C1 20010120; SK 144899 A3 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910120

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OSTRIGA, SONNET, WIRTHS & VORWE, DE

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081015

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071001

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071022

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FROH HOUSE TECH G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-08-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-03-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-10-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-10-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-05-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051016

2005-10-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FROH HOUSE TECH G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226260 T3

2005-03-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-25 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028172

2004-11-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-11-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-19 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910120 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FROH HOUSE TECH GMBH & CO. KG

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI