Global Patent Index - EP 0998872 A1

EP 0998872 A1 2000-05-10 - Working programme for dishwashing machines

Title (en)

Working programme for dishwashing machines

Title (de)

Arbeitsprogramm zum Steuern von Geschirrspülmaschinen

Title (fr)

Programme de fonctionnement pour la commande des machines à laver la vaisselle

Publication

EP 0998872 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99117510 A

Priority

IT PN980079 A

Abstract (en)

In at least an operating phase of the programme, water is let into the washing vessel (4) up to a static level (S) which is higher than the level of a recirculation filter (12, 13), a recirculating pump (10) is switched on, the water is at a certain point let partially off the vessel down to a static level (S1) which is lower than the level of the filter (12, 13), and the recirculating pump is switched on again. The performance of the recirculation filter (12) is thereby improved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; A47L 15/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4206 (2013.01); A47L 15/0049 (2013.01); A47L 15/4204 (2013.01); A47L 15/4208 (2013.01); A47L 15/4219 (2013.01); A47L 2501/02 (2013.01); A47L 2501/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998872 A1 20000510; EP 0998872 B1 20030129; DE 69905122 D1 20030306; DE 69905122 T2 20031113; ES 2192362 T3 20031001; IT 1305528 B1 20010509; IT PN980079 A1 20000502

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140904

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69905122

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69905122

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100905

2011-10-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100904

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100904

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192362 T3

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905122 P 20030306

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI