Global Patent Index - EP 0998894 A1

EP 0998894 A1 2000-05-10 - Chair-type massaging apparatus

Title (en)

Chair-type massaging apparatus

Title (de)

Sesselartige Massagevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de massage de type fauteuil

Publication

EP 0998894 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119523 A

Priority

  • JP 31244698 A
  • JP 10690599 A

Abstract (en)

A novel chair-type massaging apparatus (1) is provided including a backrest (4) provided with a mechanical massaging device (8), and a seat (3) provided with a pneumatic massaging device (45), the mechanical massaging device (8) comprising a massaging head (9), a motor (10), and a transmission mechanism (11) for causing the massaging head (9) to perform massage by transmitting the rotary power of the motor (10) thereto, the pneumatic massaging device (45) comprising a pneumatically expansible and contractible air cell (47) configured to massage the body of a human when air is supplied thereto and discharged therefrom. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 7/00 (2006.01); A61H 1/00 (2006.01); A61H 23/02 (2006.01); A61H 23/04 (2006.01); A61H 15/00 (2006.01); A61H 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 9/0078 (2013.01); A61H 7/007 (2013.01); A61H 15/0078 (2013.01); A61H 23/0263 (2013.01); A61H 2015/0028 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0149 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1427 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1623 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1654 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1669 (2013.01); A61H 2205/062 (2013.01); A61H 2205/081 (2013.01); A61H 2205/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998894 A1 20000510; EP 0998894 B1 20040526; CN 1183891 C 20050112; CN 1252984 A 20000517; DE 69917560 D1 20040701; DE 69917560 T2 20040916; HK 1026606 A1 20050603; JP 2000197676 A 20000718; KR 100596512 B1 20060703; KR 20000034965 A 20000626; TW 471966 B 20020111

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69917560

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-10-12 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917560 P 20040701

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI