Global Patent Index - EP 0998896 A3

EP 0998896 A3 2001-02-07 - Medicine dispenser

Title (en)

Medicine dispenser

Title (de)

Medikamentenspender

Title (fr)

Distributeur de médicaments

Publication

EP 0998896 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122128 A

Priority

DE 19850890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0998896A2] Device for storing medicament in portions to be taken regularly has a signal giver which indicates to the patient when it is due to take the medicament. Device for storing medicament to be taken regularly comprises: (a) a container (6) for the medicament in the required portions to be taken; (b) a system for giving out amounts of the medicament in portions; (c) a time display which determines the time for taking the medicament; (d) a signal giver which gives a signal when it is due to take the medicament; and (e) a sensor which recognizes the removal of a portion of the medicament.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 7/0481 (2013.01); A61J 7/0436 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998896 A2 20000510; EP 0998896 A3 20010207; DE 19850890 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI