Global patent index - EP 0998961 A1

EP 0998961 A1 2000-05-10 - Training apparatus with a crank for physically handicapped persons

Title (en)

Training apparatus with a crank for physically handicapped persons

Title (de)

Trainingsgerät mit einer Kurbel für Bewegungsbehinderte

Title (fr)

Appareil d'exercice avec manivelle pour handicapés physiques

Publication

EP 0998961 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122194 A

Priority

  • DE 19851339 A
  • DE 19953407 A

Abstract (en)

The training apparatus has pedals or arms arranged on crank arms and with an electronics unit dividing the crank movement within one revolution into at least two sections. The electronics unit produces within these sections different functions for the crank movement. The electronics unit is designed to assign at least one of the at least two sections to a movement area for the limbs of a user.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Trainingsgerät mit einer Kurbel für Bewegungsbehinderte vorgeschlagen, wobei an den Kurbelarmen Pedale oder dergleichen zur Verbindung mit Beinpaaren und/oder Armpaaren der trainierenden Person vorgesehen sind, und das Trainingsgerät eine Einrichtung zur Regelung und/oder Steuerung der Kurbelbewegung aufweist. Bei einer ersten erfindungsgemäßen Lösung ist eine Elektronikeinheit vorgesehen, welche die Kurbelbewegung innerhalb einer Umdrehung in wenigstens zwei Abschnitte unterteilt, und daß in Bezug auf diese Abschnitte die Elektronikeinheit unterschiedliche Funktionen für die Kurbelbewegung vorgibt. Bei einer zweiten erfindungsgemäßen Lösung ist ebenfalls eine Elektronikeinheit vorgesehen, welche die Kurbelbewegung innerhalb einer Umdrehung in wenigstens zwei Abschnitte unterteilt, wobei jedoch alternativ zur vorigen Lösung die Elektronikeinheit zur abschnittsbezogenen Messung von wenigstens einem Kurbelparameter, mit dem eine Aussage über das Tretverhalten möglich ist und zur Anzeige des Kurbelparameters und/oder eines darauf basierenden Parameters in Bezug auf den zugehörigen Abschnitt ausgestaltet ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/08 (2006.01); A63B 22/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/0007 (2013.01); A63B 21/00178 (2013.01); A63B 21/00181 (2013.01); A63B 22/0005 (2015.10); A63B 22/0605 (2013.01); A63B 2022/0038 (2013.01); A63B 2022/0041 (2013.01); A63B 2071/0652 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0865804 A1 19980923 - RECK ANTON [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998961 A1 20000510; EP 0998961 B1 20050413

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050724

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECK, ANTON

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RECK, MARTIN

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI