Global patent index - EP 0998979 A2

EP 0998979 A2 2000-05-10 - Electronic fluid dispenser

Title (en)

Electronic fluid dispenser

Title (de)

Elektronische Dosiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de dosage électronique

Publication

EP 0998979 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120596 A

Priority

DE 19850417 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical dosing apparatus comprises a motor (1) having an electrical drive (7), at least one displacing device (2) operated by the motor (1) to pipette liquid and an electrical controlling- and/or regulating device for the motor (7) having a converter (17). The electrical controlling- and/or regulating device converts a supply voltage delivered from an electrical source (24) to a supply voltage predetermined on the load of the motor (1) in the height for the drive (7).

Abstract (de)

Elektronische Dosiervorrichtung mit einer einen elektrischen Antrieb aufweisenden Antriebseinrichtung, mindestens einer von der Antriebseinrichtung antreibbaren Verdrängungseinrichtung zum Pipettieren von Flüssigkeit und einer elektronischen Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung für den Antriebsmotor mit einem Wandler, die eine von einer elektrischen Spannungsquelle gelieferte Speisespannung in eine in der Höhe auf die jeweilige Last der Antriebseinrichtung abgestimmte Versorgungsspannung für den Antriebsmotor umwandelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/02; H02P 8/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 11/16 (2006.01); B01L 3/02 (2006.01); B01L 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/0227 (2013.01); B01L 2300/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998979 A2 20000510; EP 0998979 A3 20020410; EP 0998979 B1 20080611; DE 19850417 A1 20000511; DE 19850417 C2 20020808; DE 59914784 D1 20080724; JP 2000146663 A 20000526; JP 4981200 B2 20120718; US 6499365 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-05-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090312

2008-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2008-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914784

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-07-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-06-25 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2008-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FI FR GB LI

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPPENDORF AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI