Global Patent Index - EP 0998983 A2

EP 0998983 A2 2000-05-10 - Apparatus for pressurising and dispensing a pasty material

Title (en)

Apparatus for pressurising and dispensing a pasty material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auspressen und dosierten Abgeben von fliessfähigen Massen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour mettre en pression et délivrer un produit pâteux

Publication

EP 0998983 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99104459 A

Priority

DE 29819715 U

Abstract (en)

The device has a chamber (12) for a sealant cartridge, an ejector nozzle (13), and a compressed air piston. The device housing (11) contains a compressor (30) to generate the compressed air. The compressor is preferably driven by an electric motor (20) supplied by an accumulator battery. A switch unit (50) on the housing switches the motor on and off, and simultaneously charges and relieves the compressed air connection. The pressure acting on the piston is controlled by a pressure regulator (40).

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Auspressen und dosierten Abgeben von fließfähigen Massen, mit einem Gehäuse (11), mit einem an mindestens einer Seite zu öffnenden Aufnahmeraum (12) für eine Einweg-Materialpackung, mit einer Ausspritzdüse (13), mit einem Druckluftanschluß, und mit einem an der der Ausspritzdüse (13) gegenüberliegenden Seite in dem Aufnahmeraum (12) oder in der Einweg-Materialpackung in Richtung der Ausspritzdüse (13) verschiebbaren Kolben, der die Masse vor sich herschiebt und auf diese Weise aus der Ausspritzdüse (13) ausstößt, wobei Druckluft vom Druckluftanschluß auf die von der Ausspritzdüse (13) abgewandte Seite des Kolbens geleitet ist, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß zur Erzeugung der Druckluft in/an dem Gehäuse (11) ein Kompressor (30) angeordnet ist, der von einem Elektromotor (20) angetrieben wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/015

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/015 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819715 U1 19990107; EP 0998983 A2 20000510; EP 0998983 A3 20040407

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041008

2005-02-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990324

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI