Global patent index - EP 0998990 A2

EP 0998990 A2 2000-05-10 - Method and device for controlling the width of a metal strip

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling the width of a metal strip

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Regeln der Breite eines Metallbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour régler la largeur d'une bande métallique

Publication

EP 0998990 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120828 A

Priority

DE 19851053 A

Abstract (en)

Process for regulating the width (w) of a metal strip (4) in a mill train with at least one roll stand comprises measuring the width of the metal strip behind the roll stand. To adjust the width of the metal strip, the tension in the metal strip is adjusted before the roll stand depending on the width of the strip measured behind the roll stand. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for regulating the width (w) of a metal strip (4) in a mill train.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Regeln der Breite (w) eines Metallbandes (4) in einer Walzstraße mit zumindest einem Walzgerüst, wobei die Breite (w) des Metallbandes (4) hinter dem Walzgerüst gemessen wird, wobei zur Einstellung der Breite (w) des Metallbandes (4) der Zug im Metallband (4) vor dem Walzgerüst in Abhängigkeit der hinter dem Walzgerüst gemessenen Breite (w) des Metallbandes (4) eingestellt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998990 A2 20000510; EP 0998990 A3 20021218; EP 0998990 B1 20041006; AT 278485 T 20041015; DE 19851053 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910729

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131025

2014-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 278485

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131025

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-12-05 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20070726

2005-08-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910729

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI