Global Patent Index - EP 0998991 A3

EP 0998991 A3 2001-01-03 - Operating method for a rolling stand of a rolling train

Title (en)

Operating method for a rolling stand of a rolling train

Title (de)

Betriebsverfahren für ein Walzgerüst einer Walzstrasse

Title (fr)

Procédé d'exploitation pour une cage de laminoir d'un train de laminage

Publication

EP 0998991 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99121520 A

Priority

DE 19850738 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0998991A2] Operating process for a roll stand of a mill train comprises bombarding the rollers (5) with a cooling medium (10) in a contact region (15) over a time period (T) within the rolling pause (P). Operating process for a roll stand of a mill train comprises rolling a first metal strip having a first metal strip width (b) and after a rolling pause (P) rolling a second metal strip having a second metal strip width (b), and then subjecting the rollers (5) with a cooling medium (10) during rolling of the metal strips. The rollers are bombarded with the cooling medium in a contact region (15) over a time period (T) within the rolling pause (P).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/10 (2006.01); B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/28 (2006.01); B21B 37/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/32 (2013.01); B21B 2027/103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 4130672 A1 19930318 - ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]
  • [DA] EP 0776710 A1 19970604 - SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 123 (M - 029) 30 August 1980 (1980-08-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 690 (M - 1530) 16 December 1993 (1993-12-16)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998991 A2 20000510; EP 0998991 A3 20010103; DE 19850738 A1 20000511; JP 2000140922 A 20000523; US 6164110 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI