Global Patent Index - EP 0998992 A3

EP 0998992 A3 2002-11-13 - Roll position control in cluster mills

Title (en)

Roll position control in cluster mills

Title (de)

Walzenpositionsregelung in Vielwalzengerüsten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage de la position des cylindres dans des laminoirs à cylindres multiples

Publication

EP 0998992 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99202359 A

Priority

GB 9820787 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2341816A] A dynamic position control means for a cluster mill which has a two-part pre-stressed housing in which the two parts are joined by hydraulic cylinders 28 and associated columns. It comprises an actuating means 20 located between the housings of the mill, so as to vary the relative separation or the relative orientation or both of the two halves of the housing during rolling. The actuating means includes at least one hydraulic lifting ram disposed substantially between the two halves of the housing, and ideally four hydraulic lifting rams each ram disposed at the corner position of a rectangular housing. The hydraulic lifting rams are of the doughnut type, encompassing each of the hydraulic cylinder's columns. The dynamic position control means includes position monitoring means, in particular, four position transducers 22 mounted between the four respective corners of the housings. Control means then adjust the actuating means in response to the position monitoring means or other measured data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/14 (2006.01); B21B 31/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/04 (2006.01); B21B 37/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/028 (2013.01); B21B 13/147 (2013.01); B21B 31/04 (2013.01); B21B 37/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2341816 A 20000329; GB 2341816 B 20000906; GB 9916050 D0 19990908; AT 263637 T 20040415; DE 69916212 D1 20040513; DE 69916212 T2 20050519; EP 0998992 A2 20000510; EP 0998992 A3 20021113; EP 0998992 B1 20040407; ES 2219996 T3 20041201; GB 9820787 D0 19981118

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES, LIMITED, GB

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2017-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS PLC., FRIMLEY, CAMBERLY, GB

- Document: DE 69916212

2017-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: KINNSTAETTER, KLAUS, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140719

2015-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 263637 T

- Effective date: 20140719

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130819

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS PLC., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES LTD., SHEFFIELD, GB

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-11-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS PLC., FRIMLEY, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES LTD., SHEFFIELD, YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-11-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES LTD., SHEFFIELD, YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20130717

2013-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: KINNSTAETTER, KLAUS, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20130717

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130607

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SIEMENS PLC, GB

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

2013-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100719

2012-01-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES LTD., GB

- Document: AT 263637 T

- Effective date: 20111214

2011-12-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VAI INDUSTRIES (UK) LTD., SHEFFIELD, GB

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-12-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS PLC., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VAI INDUSTRIES (UK) LTD., SHEFFIELD, GB

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-12-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS PLC., FRIMLEY, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VAI INDUSTRIES (UK) LTD., SHEFFIELD, GB

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-12-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VAI INDUSTRIES (UK) LTD., SHEFFIELD, GB

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Effective date: 20110926

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20110926

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: KINNSTAETTER, KLAUS, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20110926

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: KINNSTAETTER, KLAUS, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2011-11-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-10-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: MICHAEL FISCHER, DE

2011-09-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916212

- Representative's name: MICHAEL FISCHER, DE

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2005-05-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219996 T3

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-07-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-07-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-06-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916212 P 20040513

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-07 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAI INDUSTRIES (UK) LIMITED

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI