Global Patent Index - EP 0998998 A3

EP 0998998 A3 2002-11-20 - Method and apparatus for making wound and bended metal sheets

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for making wound and bended metal sheets

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen gewickelter und gebogener Blechteile

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de fabrication de tôles enroulées et pliées

Publication

EP 0998998 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99121642 A

Priority

DE 19850220 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0998998A2] The manufacturing method has a sheet metal band indexed in steps for separation of required lengths which are wound around a bending thorn, for formation into a smooth sleeve, with deformation of the smooth sleeve into a lipped edge sleeve by a combined automatic manufacturing process. An Independent claim for a wound sheet metal component manufacturing method is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998998 A2 20000510; EP 0998998 A3 20021120; DE 19850220 A1 20000511; DE 19850220 C2 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 53/10 A

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI