Global Patent Index - EP 0999020 A2

EP 0999020 A2 2000-05-10 - Unbalanced mass vibrations generator for a bricks moulding machine

Title (en)

Unbalanced mass vibrations generator for a bricks moulding machine

Title (de)

Umwuchtrüttler für Steinformmaschinen

Title (fr)

Générateur de vibrations à balourd pour dispositif à fabriquer des briques

Publication

EP 0999020 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121397 A

Priority

DE 19850351 A

Abstract (en)

A vibrator table (1) is used to compress concrete components, particularly paving blocks, and is equipped with imbalanced shafts (2,3,4,5) driven by motors. A device is provided for control and/or regulation of the speed or the relative phase position of the imbalance shafts, which are the rotor shafts of the motors. The motors are mounted on the vibrator table and are electrical asynchronous machines. The imbalance shafts extend at their two ends out of the motors where they support rectified imbalance weights (6-9).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Unwuchtrüttler zur Verdichtung von Betonelementen insbesondere von Pflastersteinen während ihrer Fertigung, mit einem Rütteltisch (1), mit an dem Rütteltisch (1) angeordneten Unwuchtwellen (2-5), mit den Unwuchtwellen (2-5) zugeordneten Motoren (12-15) zum Antrieb der Unwuchtwellen (2-5) und mit einer Vorrichtung zur Steuerung und/oder Regelung der Drehzahl oder der relativen Phasenlage der Unwuchtwellen (2-5). Um einen solchen Unwuchtrüttler sehr kompakt, schnell regelbar und mit gleichmäßig umlaufenden Unwuchtwellen (2-5) zu versehen wird vorgeschlagen, die Unwuchtwellen (2-5) als Rotorwellen (12-15) der Motoren auszuführen und die Motoren (12-15) an dem Rütteltisch (1) zu montieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/087; B06B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/16 (2006.01); B28B 1/087 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/0873 (2013.01); B06B 1/166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850351 A1 20000504; CA 2287851 A1 20000502; EP 0999020 A2 20000510; EP 0999020 A3 20020529

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060118

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI