Global patent index - EP 0999044 A2

EP 0999044 A2 2000-05-10 - Drying process

Title (en)

Drying process

Title (de)

Trocknungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de séchage

Publication

EP 0999044 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115913 A

Priority

DE 19850836 A

Abstract (en)

The drying method uses a dryer through which the printed paper web is passed after each printing stage, provided by a closed housing supplied with a drying gas stream for removal of the solvent for the printing ink. The drying gas stream for at least one dryer is provided by an inert gas, e.g. nitrogen.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Trocknen der in den Druckwerken einer Rotationstiefdruckmaschine auf eine Papierbahn aufgedruckten, mit Hilfe eines Lösemittels verflüssigten Farben, durchläuft die Papierbahn hinter jedem Druckwerk einen Trockner mit einem im wesentlichen geschlossenen Gehäuse, das von einem Gas durchströmt wird, das zur Aufnahme und Abführung des Lösemittels dient. Um trotz gesteigerter Geschwindigkeit der Papierbahn eine Verringerung der Lösemittel-Restkonzentration im fertigen Druckprodukt zu erzielen, ist vorgesehen, daß zumindest in einem der Trockner als Trocknungsgas ein inertes Gas Verwendung findet, dessen Durchsatz durch den Trockner so gewählt wird, daß im Trockner eine im Vergleich zur Trocknung mit Luft sehr hohe Lösemittelkonzentration entsteht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/04; F26B 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); F26B 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/0403 (2013.01); B41F 23/0409 (2013.01); B41F 23/0423 (2013.01); F26B 21/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999044 A2 20000510; EP 0999044 A3 20020508; CA 2287828 A1 20000504; DE 19850836 A1 20000511; PL 336377 A1 20000508; US 6293200 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI