Global Patent Index - EP 0999048 A1

EP 0999048 A1 2000-05-10 - Device for cleaning curved surfaces according to the cloth principle

Title (en)

Device for cleaning curved surfaces according to the cloth principle

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Reinigen gekrümmter Flächen nach dem Tuchprinzip

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer des surfaces courbes selon le principe du tissu

Publication

EP 0999048 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118776 A

Priority

DE 19850410 A

Abstract (en)

To clean curved surfaces, a clean sheet roller carries unused cleaning sheets. A dirty sheet roller receives used sheets. A pressure unit brings the cleaning sheet in contact with the surface to be cleaned. Devices are provided for the withdrawal of the cleaning sheet from the clean sheet roller and its rolling onto the dirty sheet roller. The withdrawal of the cleaning sheet (5) from the clean sheet roller (4) occurs via the pressure component (8) effecting a movement which produces an effective connection between the cleaning sheet and the surface to be cleaned. The clean sheet roller is connected with the dirty sheet roller via a traction gear (23).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zum Reinigen gekrümmter Flächen nach dem Tuchprinzip mit einer unbenutztes Reinigungstuch tragenden Saubertuchrolle, einer benutztes Tuch aufnehmenden Schmutztuchrolle, einem das Reinigungstuch in Wirkverbindung mit der zu reinigenden Fläche bringenden Andrückelement. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist die Schaffung einer Einrichtung zum Reinigen gekrümmter Flächen nach dem Tuchprinzip, die mit einfachen Mitteln und einer einen geringen Bauraum beanspruchenden Weise zu realisieren ist. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, dass der Abzug des Reinigungstuches von der Saubertuchrolle (4) durch eine die Wirkverbindung des Reinigungstuches (5) mit der zu reinigenden Fläche realisierenden Bewegung des Andrückelementes (8) erfolgt und die Saubertuchrolle (4) mit der Schmutztuchrolle (9) durch ein Zugmittelgetriebe (23) derart verbunden ist, dass unabhängig vom jeweiligen Durchmesser der Saubertuchrolle (4) und der Schmutztuchrolle (9) das Aufwickeln eines Abschnitts des Reinigungstuches (5) auf die Schmutztuchrolle (9) erfolgt, der länger oder gleich dem von der Saubertuchrolle (4) abgezogenen Abschnitt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/06 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2235/24 (2013.01); B41P 2235/242 (2013.01); B41P 2235/246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 3005469 A1 19801030 - BALDWIN GEGENHEIMER CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850410 A1 20000504; EP 0999048 A1 20000510; EP 0999048 B1 20030212; JP 2000135779 A 20000516; US 6618896 B1 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100923

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59904266

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100923

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100923

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904266

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI