Global Patent Index - EP 0999051 A3

EP 0999051 A3 2000-11-08 - Method for assembling micro injecting device and apparatus for the same

Title (en)

Method for assembling micro injecting device and apparatus for the same

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Zusammenbau einer Mikrospritzvorrichtung und dazugehöriger Apparat

Title (fr)

Procédé d'assemblage d'un micro-dispositif d'injection et appareil pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0999051 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99308741 A

Priority

RU 98119953 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999051A2] A method for assembling a micro-injecting device and an apparatus for assembling the device are disclosed. A heater chip wafer on which a plurality of heater chips are formed is fixed onto a vacuum bench, and a membrane manufactured independently of a jet chip is aligned to be separated by a predetermined space from the heater chip wafer, and the membrane is fixed on the heater chip wafer. This avoids the membrane being moved frequently in the process of aligning and assembling, thus obtaining in-advance prevention against damage to the membrane, and elimination of the necessity to align the membrane to each heater chip, thereby reducing significantly the time required for assembling. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/04 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1635 (2013.01); B41J 2/14064 (2013.01); B41J 2/1603 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1634 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0816083 A2 19980107 - SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]
  • [A] US 5506610 A 19960409 - ALTAVELA ROBERT P [US], et al
  • [A] "POLISHING CARRIER DESIGN", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 33, no. 10A, 1 March 1991 (1991-03-01), pages 197 - 198, XP000110013, ISSN: 0018-8689

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999051 A2 20000510; EP 0999051 A3 20001108; CN 1253038 A 20000517; JP 2000141668 A 20000523; JP 3045500 B2 20000529; KR 100288700 B1 20010416; KR 20000034823 A 20000626; RU 2144471 C1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/14 A, 7B 41J 2/16 B

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991116

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI