Global Patent Index - EP 0999067 A1

EP 0999067 A1 2000-05-10 - Ribbon mechanism

Title (en)

Ribbon mechanism

Title (de)

Farbbandeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Mécanisme du ruban encreur

Publication

EP 0999067 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203573 A

Priority

  • US 10689398 P
  • US 37619999 A

Abstract (en)

An integrated ribbon mechanism (10) comprises a support frame (12) having a bottom plate (38) and two side plates integrated to the bottom plate at opposite sides, a print head assembly (40) rigidly mounted on the bottom surface of a bottom plate, first and second pivotal holes (30,28) positioned on opposite side plates of the support frame, and a pair of locators (55) positioned at opposite side ends of the print head assembly (40), each locator having an extrusion portion positioned within a respective slot of the drive mechanism (2) during operation wherein the extrusion portions are smaller than the slots of the drive mechanism to allow the integrated ribbon mechanism (10) to slide against a drive mechanism, the integrated ribbon mechanism being pivotally and adjustably coupled to the drive mechanism (2) by a pair of pivot pins (54) that are smaller than the first and second pivotal holes to allow the integrated ribbon mechanism to slide against the drive mechanism wherein a ribbon strip mounted on the integrated ribbon mechanism will be pulled by a platen (60) of the drive mechanism to align the print head assembly (40) with the platen (60) during operation without losing alignment of the print head assembly with the support frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 35/08; B41J 25/316

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/316 (2006.01); B41J 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/316 (2013.01); B41J 35/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999067 A1 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070426

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIH CORPORATION

2006-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIH CORPORATION

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIH CORP.

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI