Global Patent Index - EP 0999069 A1

EP 0999069 A1 2000-05-10 - Ink vessel-containing stamp pad

Title (en)

Ink vessel-containing stamp pad

Title (de)

Tintenbehälter enthaltende Stempelkissen

Title (fr)

Tampon de timbre contenant un réservoir d'encre

Publication

EP 0999069 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121503 A

Priority

  • JP 31050298 A
  • US 34768599 A

Abstract (en)

An ink vessel-containing stamp pad having an ink pad (5) saturated with ink, the main body (1) having ink storage area (6) which stores an ink vessel (3), a cap (2) which covers said ink pad and is freely placeable on and removable from said main body, said ink vessel stored in said ink storage area and a bottom plug (4) covering the exterior of said ink storage area which stores said ink vessel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41K 1/02; B41K 1/36; B41K 1/52; B41K 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41K 1/02 (2006.01); B41K 1/36 (2006.01); B41K 1/52 (2006.01); B41K 1/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41K 1/56 (2013.01); B41K 1/02 (2013.01); B41K 1/36 (2013.01); B41K 1/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999069 A1 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-03-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INK VESSEL-CONTAINING STAMP PAD AND METHOD FOR MAKING A STAMP PAD

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI