Global Patent Index - EP 0999074 A1

EP 0999074 A1 2000-05-10 - Method for realising printed products

Title (en)

Method for realising printed products

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Druckerzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour réaliser des produits imprimés

Publication

EP 0999074 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811094 A

Priority

EP 98811094 A

Abstract (en)

The printed matter production process applies to products (3) made from folded sheets (2). These sheets are partly glued to a cover (4) on the folded edges. For feeding in and glue application to perforations in the fold region, the sheets are moved forward on a saddle shaped conveying or collection sector (1), riding on the saddle.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung von Druckerzeugnissen, wie Zeitschriften, Broschuren oder dgl., aus gefalzten Druckbogen, durch teilweises gegenseitiges Aneinanderkleben der Druckbogen an den Falzkanten zu einem gebundenen Rücken, werden die Druckbogen zur Anbringung und anschliessenden Beleimung einer im Falzbruch vorgesehenen Perforation auf einer sattelförmigen Förder- bzw. Sammelstrecke rittlings aufliegend fortbewegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 5/00; B42C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 5/00 (2006.01); B42C 9/00 (2006.01); B42C 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 9/0006 (2013.01); B42C 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999074 A1 20000510; EP 0999074 B1 20060201; DE 59813367 D1 20060413; JP 2000135876 A 20000516; JP 4439636 B2 20100324; US 6328519 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060406

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813367

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-02-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060201

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020802

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI