Global patent index - EP 0999099 A2

EP 0999099 A2 2000-05-10 - Method for reprogramming of apparatus containing control units especially in cars

Title (en)

Method for reprogramming of apparatus containing control units especially in cars

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Umprogrammieren von Steuereinheiten aufweisenden Geräten, insbesondere in Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Procédé de reprogrammation d'appareils contenant une unité de control, en particulier dans des automobiles

Publication

EP 0999099 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121213 A

Priority

DE 19850903 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves altering a data set in the control unit using a radio signal. The radio signal is used to change the data in a program code of the control unit. The control unit is used to control the engine of the motor vehicle. The control unit may be designed to receive radio data system (RDS) signals, or signals from a mobile telephone system. The control unit may generate a signal to confirm reception of the radio signal.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Umprogrammieren eines eine Steuereinheit aufweisendes Gerätes, insbesondere in Kraftfahrzeugen dienen durch Funksignal übertragene Daten der Korrektur eines in einer Steuereinheit enthaltenen Programmcodes. Dadurch kann ein Werkstattaufenthalt vermieden und eine schnelle Anpassung des Programmcodes an fortschreitende Entwicklungen und veränderte Betriebsbedingungen für den Fahrer unbemerkt durchgeführt werden. Hierzu kann das Funksignal mittels eines Radio-Daten-Systems oder einer Mobiltelefonanlage übertragen werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 16/02; H04M 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/13 (2008.01); H04H 60/70 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/13 (2013.01); F02D 41/2487 (2013.01); H04H 20/91 (2013.01); H04H 60/70 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999099 A2 20000510; EP 0999099 A3 20011219; DE 19850903 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031022

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020121

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 60R 16/02 A, 7H 04M 11/00 B, 7G 07C 5/00 B, 7H 04H 1/00 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI