Global Patent Index - EP 0999111 A1

EP 0999111 A1 2000-05-10 - End stop with a cross stop section acting in the cross direction of a railway vehicle at least in a curved orientation

Title (en)

End stop with a cross stop section acting in the cross direction of a railway vehicle at least in a curved orientation

Title (de)

Begrenzungsanschlag mit einem mindestens bei Bogenstellung in Querrichtung eines Schienenfahrzeuges wirksamen Queranschlagsabschnitt

Title (fr)

Butée de limitation avec une section de butée transversale active dans le sens transversal d'un véhicule ferroviaire au moins pendant l'orientation en courbe

Publication

EP 0999111 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121455 A

Priority

DE 19851157 A

Abstract (en)

The stop has a transverse stop shaped sector which acts with a cam track on the limiting stop (2) and a support roll (4) to limit the transverse deviation of the wagon box (1) relative to the bogie (3). To limit not only the transverse play between the bogie and the wagon box, but also the rotation of the bogie relative to the wagon box, there is also a shaped sector for this purpose.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Begrenzungsanschlag mit einem mindestens bei Bogenstellung in Querrichtung eines Schienenfahrzeuges wirksamen Queranschlagskonturabschnitt (5), der im Zusammenwirken mit einer auf dem Begrenzungsanschlag (2) angeordneten Konturbahn und auf dieser abrollenden Stützrolle (4) die Querauslenkung eines Wagenkastens (1) eines Schienenfahrzeuges gegenüber einem Fahrwerk (3) begrenzt, wobei entweder der Begrenzungsanschlag (2) oder die Stützrolle (4) dem Fahrwerk (3) oder dem Wagenkasten (1) zugeordnet ist. Um bei kompakter Bauweise sowohl die Begrenzung des Querspiels zwischen Fahrwerk (3) und Wagenkasten (1) als auch die Drehbegrenzung des Fahrwerks (3) gegenüber dem Wagenkasten (1) eines Schienenfahrzeuges zu ermöglichen, ist an dem Begrenzungsanschlag (2) zur Begrenzung des Querspiels auch ein Konturabschnitt zur Drehbegrenzung (Drehbegrenzungskonturabschnitt 6) angeordnet, der die Ausdrehbarkeit des Fahrwerks (3) gegenüber dem Wagenkasten (1) begrenzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/24; B61F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/02 (2006.01); B61F 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/24 (2013.01); B61F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4425562 C1 19951207 - AEG SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999111 A1 20000510; EP 0999111 B1 20041208; AT 284335 T 20041215; DE 19851157 A1 20000511; ES 2235419 T3 20050701

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050508

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALSTOM LHB G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-07-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235419 T3

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-03-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-03-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911232 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030515

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI