Global Patent Index - EP 0999143 A3

EP 0999143 A3 2000-09-27 - Triangular composite container

Title (en)

Triangular composite container

Title (de)

Dreieckiger Verbundbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient composite de forme triangulaire

Publication

EP 0999143 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303440 A

Priority

US 18803798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999143A2] A triangular composite container has a composite bottom closure and an outwardly-curled beaded top edge adapted to receive a membrane closure and a snap-on overcap. The composite container has outwardly-bowed curved side walls and curved corners defining six circular segments in transverse cross-section arranged symmetrically and at least some of which have different radii. Preferably, the container is of a combination triangular and circular shape in transverse cross-section. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 3/02; B65D 3/22; B65D 8/04; B65D 51/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 3/02 (2006.01); B65D 3/04 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 51/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 15/08 (2013.01); B65D 3/02 (2013.01); B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 51/20 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0018 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0093 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00111 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00527 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00638 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0074 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999143 A2 20000510; EP 0999143 A3 20000927; AR 013038 A1 20001122; BR 9902222 A 20000229; CA 2270686 A1 20000506; ID 23730 A 20000511; JP 2000142663 A 20000523; JP 3108688 B2 20001113; PL 332951 A1 20000508; TW 385294 B 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020309

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011211

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GR IT NL

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 3/02 A, 7B 65D 8/04 B, 7B 65D 51/20 B, 7B 65D 3/22 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GR IT NL

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI