Global Patent Index - EP 0999159 A2

EP 0999159 A2 2000-05-10 - Reel winding device

Title (en)

Reel winding device

Title (de)

Rollenwickeleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bobinage

Publication

EP 0999159 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121318 A

Priority

DE 19851023 A

Abstract (en)

The roll winding device (1) has at least one rolling bed (6, 7) to receive at least one winding roll (8, 9), formed by a support roll (2) and a carrier roll device (4, 5). This device has a carrier body (17, 18) for each winding roll, the axial length of which is matched to that of the winding roll. It extends at its axial endface sufficiently to leave free a working space into which the roll core drive (13, 14) can be run.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Rollenwickeleinrichtung (1) angegeben mit mindestens einem Wickelbett (6, 7) zur Aufnahme mindestens einer Wickelrolle (8, 9), das durch eine Stützwalze (2) und eine Tragwalzenanordnung (4, 5) gebildet ist. Hierbei möchte man eine weiter Möglichkeit der Wickelhärtebeeinflussung, insbesondere beim Anwickeln, angeben können. Dazu weist die Tragwalzenanordnung (4, 5) für jede Wikkelrolle (8, 9) einen Tragkörper (17, 18) auf, dessen axiale Länge an die der Wickelrolle (8, 9) angepaßt ist und der an seinen axialen Enden Stirnseiten mit einer vorbestimmten Erstreckung aufweist, die einen Arbeitsraum (21) frei lassen, in dem ein Rollenkernantrieb (13, 14) einfahrbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/08; B65H 18/10; B65H 18/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/02 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 18/021 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414866 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999159 A2 20000510; EP 0999159 A3 20040204; EP 0999159 B1 20051012; DE 19851023 A1 20000518; DE 19851023 B4 20051103; DE 59912650 D1 20060223; US 6290168 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091026

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061026

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AG

2006-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912650 P 20060223

2006-02-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 18/08 A

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 18/26 B

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 18/10 B

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AG

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI