Global Patent Index - EP 0999160 A2

EP 0999160 A2 2000-05-10 - Web winding system

Title (en)

Web winding system

Title (de)

Bahnwickelsystem

Title (fr)

Système à enrouler une bande

Publication

EP 0999160 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100364 A

Priority

  • EP 96108947 A
  • EP 93904507 A
  • US 82337992 A
  • US 82366592 A
  • US 82396192 A

Abstract (en)

A web winding system for winding adhesive backed web on cores mounted on wind-up spindles. The web is supported on a rotating suction drum. A knife mounted on a rotating wheel cuts the web against the supporting drum. A tab bar is mounted on the wheel adjacent to the knife, and applies a tab to the web in registration with the cut. In a second position of the wheel a tab source moves toward the tab bar and applies a tab to its surface. The knife is heated by a heater to a temperature above adhesive softening and below adhesive carbonizing to prevent adhesive to stick to or to accumulate on the knife. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/29; B65H 19/22; B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/10 (2006.01); B26D 7/27 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/29 (2013.01); B26D 7/10 (2013.01); B26D 7/27 (2013.01); B65H 19/22 (2013.01); B65H 19/2238 (2013.01); B65H 19/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41894 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2312 (2013.01); B65H 2701/377 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9314013 A2 19930722; WO 9314013 A3 19940106; AU 3583893 A 19930803; AU 673156 B2 19961031; AU 6803096 A 19970109; AU 681833 B2 19970904; CA 2127285 A1 19930722; CA 2127285 C 20010911; CZ 9401754 A3 19950118; DE 69306752 D1 19970130; DE 69306752 T2 19970605; DE 69329470 D1 20001026; DE 69329470 T2 20010419; DE 69332572 D1 20030123; DE 69332572 T2 20030731; EP 0620799 A1 19941026; EP 0620799 B1 19961218; EP 0733571 A2 19960925; EP 0733571 A3 19961227; EP 0733571 B1 20000920; EP 0999160 A2 20000510; EP 0999160 A3 20000524; EP 0999160 B1 20021211; HK 1006962 A1 19990326; JP 3315407 B2 20020819; JP H07502958 A 19950330; SK 88894 A3 19941109

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070120

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070120

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070120

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060117

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69332572 20030123

2002-12-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 620799

2002-12-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 733571

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-05-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 620799

2000-05-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 733571

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT