Global Patent Index - EP 0999160 A3

EP 0999160 A3 2000-05-24 - Web winding system

Title (en)

Web winding system

Title (de)

Bahnwickelsystem

Title (fr)

Système à enrouler une bande

Publication

EP 0999160 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00100364 A

Priority

  • EP 96108947 A
  • EP 93904507 A
  • US 82337992 A
  • US 82366592 A
  • US 82396192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9314013A2] A web winding system (10) for winding adhesive backed web (12) on cores (14) mounted on wind-up spindles (28, 30). The web (12) is supported on a rotating suction drum (24). A knife (32) mounted on a rotating wheel (34) cuts the web (12) against the supporting drum (24). A tab bar (68) is mounted on the wheel (34) adjacent to the knife (32), and applies a tab (60) to the web (12) in registration with the cut. In a second position of the wheel (34) a tab source (70) moves toward the tab bar (68) and applies a tab (60) to its surface (68). The knife (32) is heated by a heater (35) to a temperature above adhesive softening and below adhesive carbonizing to prevent adhesive to stick to or to accumulate on the knife (32). The web (12) is lead to the supporting drum (24) around a stationary gapping roller (18) and a retractable gapping roller (22), mounted on an arm (42) which is pivotable around roller (10). When the knife (32) has cut the web (12) the arm (42) pivots clockwise, and lengthens the distance between retractable roller (22) and supporting drum (24), thus forcing the web to slide on the drum (24), and to form a gap between the leading cut end (36') and the trailing cut end (36) of the web. The gap allows for flying transfer of the web between the cores (14) on the two wind-up spindles (28, 30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/29; B65H 19/22; B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/10 (2006.01); B26D 7/27 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/29 (2013.01); B26D 7/10 (2013.01); B26D 7/27 (2013.01); B65H 19/22 (2013.01); B65H 19/2238 (2013.01); B65H 19/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41894 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2312 (2013.01); B65H 2701/377 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9314013 A2 19930722; WO 9314013 A3 19940106; AU 3583893 A 19930803; AU 673156 B2 19961031; AU 6803096 A 19970109; AU 681833 B2 19970904; CA 2127285 A1 19930722; CA 2127285 C 20010911; CZ 9401754 A3 19950118; DE 69306752 D1 19970130; DE 69306752 T2 19970605; DE 69329470 D1 20001026; DE 69329470 T2 20010419; DE 69332572 D1 20030123; DE 69332572 T2 20030731; EP 0620799 A1 19941026; EP 0620799 B1 19961218; EP 0733571 A2 19960925; EP 0733571 A3 19961227; EP 0733571 B1 20000920; EP 0999160 A2 20000510; EP 0999160 A3 20000524; EP 0999160 B1 20021211; HK 1006962 A1 19990326; JP 3315407 B2 20020819; JP H07502958 A 19950330; SK 88894 A3 19941109

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070120

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070120

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070120

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060117

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69332572 20030123

2002-12-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 620799

2002-12-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 733571

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-05-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 620799

2000-05-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 733571

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT