Global Patent Index - EP 0999163 A3

EP 0999163 A3 2001-01-17 - Device for creating a gap in a stream of sheets in shingled formation

Title (en)

Device for creating a gap in a stream of sheets in shingled formation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schaffen einer Lücke in einem geschuppten Bogenstrom

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour créer un intervalle dans un courant de feuilles en formation imbriquée

Publication

EP 0999163 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120664 A

Priority

DE 19851371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999163A2] The device includes a gap traction trolley (22) which creates gaps by running along a guide (23) in the conveying direction (15), shortening the gap traction conveyor (31) and lengthening the supply conveyor (18). A suction device (41) on the trolley is lowered and air from a blower (42) is blown into the gap which appears. The trolley runs ahead of the input conveyor and draws out the gap, so that a point (46) for switching to the other of two conveyor trolleys (47, 48) can be operated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2006.01); B65H 29/68 (2006.01); B65H 33/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2013.01); B65H 33/12 (2013.01); B65H 2406/342 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1762 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999163 A2 20000510; EP 0999163 A3 20010117; EP 0999163 B1 20030716; DE 19851371 A1 20000511; ES 2202985 T3 20040401; JP 2000153945 A 20000606; US 6189884 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091020

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202985 T3

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906291 P 20030821

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI