Global patent index - EP 0999165 A2

EP 0999165 A2 2000-05-10 - Method of folding signatures and folding apparatus with braking grippers

Title (en)

Method of folding signatures and folding apparatus with braking grippers

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Falzen von Signaturen und Falzapparat mit Bremsgreifern

Title (fr)

Méthode de pliage de feuilles et un appareil de pliage muni de pinces de freinage

Publication

EP 0999165 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120043 A

Priority

US 18643598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6038974A] A gripper deceleration cross folder device having a rotatably mounted jaw cylinder including a plurality of jaw devices, a rotatably mounted gripper decelerator drum forming a nip with the jaw cylinder, and a plurality of gripper decelerator devices mounted on the gripper decelerator drum, each gripper decelerator for gripping and decelerating one of a plurality of signatures at a time. A respective tucking device corresponding to each of the plurality of gripper decelerator devices for tucking each one of the signatures into a corresponding one of the plurality of jaw devices after the decelerating of the signature so as to fold the signature.

Abstract (de)

Ein Falzapparat umfaßt einen drehbar gelagerten Falzklappenzylinder (72) mit einer Vielzahl von Falzklappen (74a-e) und eine Greifertrommel (52) mit einer Vielzahl von darauf angeordneten Bremsgreifern (54a-e). Die Greifertrommel (52) und der Falzklappenzylinder (72) bilden einen Zylinderspalt (70). Jeder der Bremsgreifer (54a-e) ist in einer Weise ausgebildet, daß er eine ankommende Signatur (58a-e) greift und zwischen dem Übernahmepunkt (50) und der Zylinderspalt (70) abbremst. An dem Zylinderspalt (70) wird ein dem jeweiligen Bremsgreifer (54a-e) zugeordnetes Falzmesser (56a-e) aus der Umfangsoberfläche (55) der Greifertrommel (52) herausbewegt, so daß die abgebremste Signatur (58a-e) in die zugeordnete Falzklappe (74a-e) hineingeschoben und auf diese Weise gefalzt wird. Nach der Übergabe der gefalzten Signatur (58a-e) an den Falzklappenzylinder (74) wird der nun leere Greifer (54a-e) wieder beschleunigt, bis er am Übernahmepunkt (50) eine weitere ankommende Signatur (58a-e) greift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/16; B65H 29/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/28 (2006.01); B65H 29/68 (2006.01); B65H 45/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/163 (2013.01); B65H 29/68 (2013.01); B65H 45/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6038974 A 20000321; DE 19949938 A1 20000511; EP 0999165 A2 20000510; EP 0999165 A3 20020306; JP 2000143090 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020907

2003-01-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI