Global Patent Index - EP 0999167 A3

EP 0999167 A3 2000-11-08 - Yarn splicing method for winding and winder

Title (en)

Yarn splicing method for winding and winder

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Spleissen von Fäden zum Aufwickeln und Aufwickelvorrichting

Title (fr)

Procédé de raccordement de fils textiles pour le bobinage et bobinoir

Publication

EP 0999167 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99120631 A

Priority

JP 31414498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999167A2] The present invention provides a yarn splicing method for a winder and a winder that can eliminate fluffs from the surface of a yarn joint. In a winder 1 having a splicing device 6 placed between a yarn supplying section 2 and a winding section 7, a yarn joint finishing device 10 comprising a liquid applying member 11 for applying a liquid to a yarn running path R and a fluff smoothing member 12 that comes in contact with the yarn running path R is provided in the splicing device 6 and its neighborhood. The liquid applying member 11 and fluff smoothing member 12 of the yarn joint finishing device 10 are integrated together using a contact surface member 13 that wets the liquid applying member and fluff smoothing member with a liquid. The yarn joint finishing device comprises two sets of the contact surface member 13, and the contact surface member 13 of each set can advance and withdraw between a standby position located away from the yarn running path R and a finished position at which the yarn running path R is sandwiched. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 69/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/06 (2006.01); B65H 71/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/061 (2013.01); B65H 69/066 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999167 A2 20000510; EP 0999167 A3 20001108; EP 0999167 B1 20030910; DE 69911142 D1 20031016; DE 69911142 T2 20040708; JP 2000143096 A 20000523; JP 3438618 B2 20030818

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071018

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911142 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI