Global patent index - EP 0999168 A2

EP 0999168 A2 2000-05-10 - Dual action braking device for elevators or rack serving equipment

Title (en)

Dual action braking device for elevators or rack serving equipment

Title (de)

Bremsfangvorrichtung mit Doppel-Aktion für Aufzüge oder Regalbediengeräte (RBG)

Title (fr)

Dispositif de freinage à double action pour ascenseurs ou dispositifs de desserte de rayonnage

Publication

EP 0999168 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119961 A

Priority

  • DE 19850678 A
  • DE 19852040 A
  • DE 19940059 A

Abstract (en)

The brake catching device has a bracket (5) fitting round a guide rail (8). There is an active brake shoe (2) on one side of the guide rail and a passive brake (reaction) shoe (6) on the other. The passive brake shoe is in the form of a double wedge rocket (6), which can turn in the bracket to ensure release from the trap in either direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Doppel-Bremsfangvorrichtung für Aufzüge oder Regalbediengeräte, mit einer Konsole (5), die eine Führungsschiene (8) umgreift und eine aktive Bremsbacke (2) auf der einen Seite und eine passive Bremsbacke (6) auf der anderen Seite der Führungsschiene (8) enthält. Die passive Bremsbacke ist als Doppelkeilschwinge (6) ausgebildet und ermöglicht so bei kompaktem, einfachem Aufbau der Gesamtvorrichtung ein einfaches Lösen der Doppel-Bremsfangvorrichtung aus dem Fang sowohl in der einen als auch in der anderen Richtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999168 A2 20000510; EP 0999168 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050212

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI