Global Patent Index - EP 0999257 A2

EP 0999257 A2 2000-05-10 - Process and apparatus for the prevention of emissions at the open levelling door of a coke oven

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the prevention of emissions at the open levelling door of a coke oven

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vermeidung von Emissionen an der Planiertür eines Koksofens

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour éviter les émissions à la porte de nivellement d'un four à coke

Publication

EP 0999257 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113440 A

Priority

DE 19850105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19850105C1] Before charging the chamber, a dedicated air sealing system is connected. This includes a lower outlet (2) for lump solids. It is connected to a leveling opening (3) of the opened oven door (4). Its opening for leveling rod entry (6) has an external connecting section (5) and an internal flap valve (8). The oven is filled with coal from above by a charging car. The valve is opened and the leveling rod (7) is introduced to even-out the upper surface of the coal. An Independent claim is included for corresponding equipment. Preferred features: During leveling, air blown into the lock, is intended to seal against emissions. In the equipment, a flap valve performs the shut-off duty and there are nozzles for blanketing air preventing emissions. In a more detailed implementation, a fan-driven recirculation system with sheet baffle partition directs the air along the leveling rod, setting up a pressure gradient to block emissions. A lower opening is left at the rear of the partition.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Vermeidung von Emissionen an der geöffneten Planiertür eines Kokskammerofens während einer Ofenbeschickung und einer Planierung der Schüttgutoberfläche. Die Vorrichtung besteht aus einem horizontal verfahrbaren Gehäuse (1), das einen unterseitigen Auslaß (2) für stückiges Material, einen an die Planieröffnung (3) der geöffneten Planiertür (4) anschließbaren Anschlußstutzen (5) und eine dem Anschlußstutzen gegenüberliegende Eintrittsöffnung (6) für eine Planierstange (7) aufweist. Die Planierstange (7) ist durch die Eintrittsöffnung (6) horizontal in die Planieröffnung (3) ein- und ausfahrbar. Der Anschlußstutzen (5) ist erfindungsgemäß mit einer Absperreinrichtung (8) ausgerüstet, die innerhalb des Gehäuses (1) angeordnet ist. Während der Ofenbeschickung verschließt die Absperreinrichtung (8) den mit der Planieröffnung (3) verbundenen Anschlußstutzen (5) Unmittelbar vor Beginn des Planiervorganges wird die gehäuseinnenseitige Absperreinrichtung (8) geöffnet, so daß die Planierstange (7) in die Planieröffnung einfahren sowie die Schüttgutoberfläche in der Koksofenkammer planiert werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 27/04 (2006.01); C10B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 27/04 (2013.01); C10B 37/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850105 C1 20000330; AT 232230 T 20030215; EP 0999257 A2 20000510; EP 0999257 A3 20010314; EP 0999257 B1 20030205; ES 2192358 T3 20031001

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160710

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160710

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160710

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160710

2017-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 232230 T

- Effective date: 20160710

2017-03-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904216

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150711

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150710

2016-03-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59904216

2015-11-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904216

- Representative's name: ALBRECHT, RAINER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140711

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59904216

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59904216

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904216

- Representative's name: ALBRECHT, RAINER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904216

- Representative's name: RAINER ALBRECHT, DE

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100710

2006-07-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-03-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0999257E

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192358 T3

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-05-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904216 P 20030313

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI