Global Patent Index - EP 0999295 A2

EP 0999295 A2 2000-05-10 - Arrangement for the electrogalvanic metal coating of strips

Title (en)

Arrangement for the electrogalvanic metal coating of strips

Title (de)

Anordnung zur elektrogalvanischen Metallbeschichtung von Bändern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le revêtement métallique des bandes par voie électrogalvanique

Publication

EP 0999295 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118136 A

Priority

DE 19848876 A

Abstract (en)

Each anode strip has a protective current supply whose voltage is measured so that the production of cathodic regions is excluded on the anode strips. The current supply is interrupted to deposit the metal from the electrolyte. Apparatus for the electrogalvanic metal coating of strips running through an acidic electrolyte enriched with metal has an insoluble anode arranged parallel to the strip from which the current flows to the strip connected as cathode. Metal is deposited from the electrolyte on the surface of the strip and each anode is divided into anode strips parallel to the running direction of the strip. The anode strips are insulated from each other and each strip is provided with a current to deposit the metal from the electrolyte.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung zur elektrogalvanischen Metallbeschichtung von Bändern. Um an nicht mit Strom beaufschlagten Anodenstreifen der parallel zu dem Band angeordneten Anoden Korrosionsschäden zu vermeiden, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß jeder Anodenstreifen eine Schutzstromversorgung besitzt. Die Spannung der Schutzstromversorgung ist dabei so zu bemessen, daß keine kathodischen Bereiche auf den Anodenstreifen entstehen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 7/06; C25D 17/12; C25D 21/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 21/12 (2006.01); C25D 5/00 (2006.01); C25D 7/06 (2006.01); C25D 17/00 (2006.01); C25D 19/00 (2006.01); C25D 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 7/0692 (2013.01); C25D 7/0642 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6589400 B1 20030708; BR 9906119 A 20010116; CN 101575722 A 20091111; CN 1252458 A 20000510; EP 0999295 A2 20000510; EP 0999295 A3 20060517; JP 2000129497 A 20000509; JP 4405005 B2 20100127; KR 20000029143 A 20000525; RU 2228395 C2 20040510

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100203

2009-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS SIEMAG AG

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071221

2007-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990928

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI