Global Patent Index - EP 0999298 A2

EP 0999298 A2 2000-05-10 - Ring spinning machine with individual spindle drives

Title (en)

Ring spinning machine with individual spindle drives

Title (de)

Ringspinnmaschine mit Individuellen Spindelantrieben

Title (fr)

Métier à filer à anneaux avec des dispositif d'entraînement de broches individuels

Publication

EP 0999298 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117969 A

Priority

JP 31508898 A

Abstract (en)

In a spindle driving apparatus for a ring fine spinning machine, a plurality of spindles have dedicated synchronous motors, inverters and control circuits individually connected thereto, and the control circuits are connected to a common dc power supply. Each control circuit outputs a PWM signal to the corresponding inverter, monitors a PWM duty, detects a drastic change in the driving condition of the corresponding spindle as a result of a change in the PWM duty, and stops the corresponding synchronous motor through that inverter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/244

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999298 A2 20000510; EP 0999298 A3 20000906; EP 0999298 B1 20040121; CN 1188557 C 20050209; CN 1253187 A 20000517; DE 69914283 D1 20040226; DE 69914283 T2 20041021

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090916

2010-03-10 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041020

2005-09-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041020

2005-03-02 [26D] OPPOSITION DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26D

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH &AMP; CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-12-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69914283

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TSUBOI, MASAYOSHI

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SHINOZAKI, YUTAKA

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: UEMATSU, TATSUYA

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ODACHI, YASUHARU

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021105

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 01H 1/244 A, 7H 02H 7/085 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI