Global Patent Index - EP 0999298 A3

EP 0999298 A3 2000-09-06 - Ring spinning machine with individual spindle drives

Title (en)

Ring spinning machine with individual spindle drives

Title (de)

Ringspinnmaschine mit Individuellen Spindelantrieben

Title (fr)

Métier à filer à anneaux avec des dispositif d'entraînement de broches individuels

Publication

EP 0999298 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99117969 A

Priority

JP 31508898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999298A2] In a spindle driving apparatus for a ring fine spinning machine, a plurality of spindles have dedicated synchronous motors, inverters and control circuits individually connected thereto, and the control circuits are connected to a common dc power supply. Each control circuit outputs a PWM signal to the corresponding inverter, monitors a PWM duty, detects a drastic change in the driving condition of the corresponding spindle as a result of a change in the PWM duty, and stops the corresponding synchronous motor through that inverter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/244; H02H 7/085

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999298 A2 20000510; EP 0999298 A3 20000906; EP 0999298 B1 20040121; CN 1188557 C 20050209; CN 1253187 A 20000517; DE 69914283 D1 20040226; DE 69914283 T2 20041021

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Free text: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI#2-1, TOYODA-CHO#KARIYA-SHI, AICHI-KEN (JP) -TRANSFER TO- KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI#2-1, TOYODA-CHO#KARIYA-SHI, AICHI-KEN (JP)

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090916

2010-03-10 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041020

2005-09-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041020

2005-03-02 [26D] OPPOSITION DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH &AMP; CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-12-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914283 P 20040226

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TSUBOI, MASAYOSHI

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHINOZAKI, YUTAKA

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UEMATSU, TATSUYA

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ODACHI, YASUHARU

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 1/244 A, 7H 02H 7/085 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI