Global Patent Index - EP 0999299 A3

EP 0999299 A3 2000-11-15 - Apparatus for the automatically changing of the cones for feeding the yarn to a textile machine and method thereof

Title (en)

Apparatus for the automatically changing of the cones for feeding the yarn to a textile machine and method thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Wechseln von Garnkonen zum Führen des Garnes an einer Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le changement automatique de cônes pour amener le fil à une machine textile

Publication

EP 0999299 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99121398 A

Priority

IT VC980016 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999299A2] An apparatus 10 for automatically effecting the change of the cones for feeding the weft yarn 12 to a textile machine 14 such as, for instance, a loom or a warper, comprising a rotating magazine 21 on which the various cones of weft yarn are loaded, a known yarn feeding device 22 adjacent to the machine 14, and an intermediate assembly 23, arranged between the magazine 21 and the feeding device 22, for effecting the cutting and the knotting of the weft yarn 12 during the change of the cones. Upon attainment of the predetermined length for the fabric manufactured by the machine 14 and at the consequent stop of the latter, a control assembly 24 of the apparatus 10 actuates successively the cut of the weft yarn 12 by means of the intermediate assembly 23, the rotation of the magazine 21 for removing an old cone 11a and arranging a new cone 11c in place of the old cone 11a near the intermediate assembly 23, and the activation of said assembly for re-establishing the continuity of the yarn 12 to be fed to the loom 14, by knotting the end of the yarn coming from the new cone 11c with the end of the yarn previously cut and positioned on the side of the feeding device 22. The apparatus 10 allows to change the cones for feeding the weft yarn 12 in a completely automatic way, without requiring any overseeing by an operator. Besides the normal weaving production, the apparatus 10 is particularly advantageous and useful in the manufacturing of fabric samples, allowing to change quickly, and without any manual intervention, the cones for feeding the yarn on the basis of the specific pattern of the various fabric samples. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 49/12; B65H 67/02; B65H 69/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/12 (2006.01); B65H 67/02 (2006.01); B65H 69/00 (2006.01); B65H 69/06 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 49/12 (2013.01); B65H 67/02 (2013.01); B65H 69/00 (2013.01); B65H 69/061 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999299 A2 20000510; EP 0999299 A3 20001115; IT 1305975 B1 20010523; IT VC980016 A1 20000508; IT VC980016 D0 19981106

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040727

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TARABBIA, MARIO

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TARABBIA, MARIO

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI