Global Patent Index - EP 0999305 A2

EP 0999305 A2 2000-05-10 - Apparatus for treating a web material

Title (en)

Apparatus for treating a web material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le traitement d' une bande de matériau

Publication

EP 0999305 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113290 A

Priority

DE 19850760 A

Abstract (en)

A web (14) of paper or cardboard is dried by passing over a support surface (22) to move with a porous support blanket (16) around a deflection roller (18) between the drying cylinders. Before the roller (18), it passes over a cohesive underpressure zone (24), with the suction box wall (26) and at least one other wall fitted with suction openings (34). The assembly has at least one additional suction opening slit (34). At the support, the web (14) is in contact with the smooth support surface (22), in its travel with the support blanket (16). At the leading end of the underpressure zone (24), a seal (28) acts with the support blanket (16) where the web (14) leaves the support surface (22). At least one additional suction opening (34) is at the leading end of the underpressure zone (24), as a slit opening across the direction (L) of web (14) travel and over part of the machine width. The additional suction opening slit (34) runs from a web leader or a starter edge strip zone of the web (14), across its direction (L) of travel. An additional suction opening can be at both side edges of the web (14), which can be outside the web width and matched to another paper edge. The additional slit suction opening can be aligned along the direction (L) of web travel. A slit suction opening (34), at the leading end of the underpressure zone (24) and across the direction (L) of web movement, is adjacent to a slit suction opening along the line (L) of web travel and opens into it. The first slit suction opening (32) projects beyond the web width, on both sides. The deflection roller (18) is perforated and/or ridged. The suction box (20) shrouds the zone of the deflection roller (18) which is not covered by the web (14) and the blanket (16). The support surface (22) is on a rotating drying cylinder (10) and the blanket (16) is a drying blanket or fourdrinier.

Abstract (de)

In einer Vorrichtung zur Behandlung der Materialbahn 14 wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn ist die Materialbahn 14 über wenigstens eine insbesondere glatte Stützfläche 22 und anschließend zusammen mit einem porösen Stützband 16 zu einer Umlenkwalze 18 oder dergleichen geführt, wobei die von der Stützfläche 22 ablaufende Materialbahn 14 mittels einer Unterdruckzone 24 an das poröse Stützband 16 ansaugbar ist, die an die von der Materialbahn 14 abgewandte Seite des porösen Stützbandes 16 angrenzt und zwischen diesem und einer gegenüberliegenden Wand 26 eines Saugkastens 20 definiert sowie an ihrem in Bahnlaufrichtung L vorderen Ende durch wenigstens ein mit dem Stützband 16 zusammenwirkendes Dichtelement 28 abgedichtet ist und sich mit ihrem hinteren Ende zumindest im wesentlichen bis zur Umlenkwalze 18 erstreckt. Die Saugkastenwand 26 ist mit einer insbesondere schlitzartigen ersten Saugöffnung 32 versehen, die im Bereich des der Umlenkwalze 18 benachbarten hinteren Endes der Unterdruckzone 24 angeordnet und durch die hindurch Luft aus der Unterdruckzone 24 absaugbar ist. Die Saugkastenwand 26 ist mit wenigstens einer weiteren in die zusammenhängende Unterdruckzone 24 mündenden Saugöffnung 34 versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999305 A2 20000510; EP 0999305 A3 20040211; DE 19850760 A1 20000511; US 6224715 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI