Global Patent Index - EP 0999307 A2

EP 0999307 A2 2000-05-10 - Road tunnel assembly for improving access for traffic in congested areas

Title (en)

Road tunnel assembly for improving access for traffic in congested areas

Title (de)

Strassentunnelanordnung zur Verkehrserschliessung von Ballungsräumen

Title (fr)

Ensemble de tunnels routiers pour l'établissement d'un réseau routier dans des zones urbanisées

Publication

EP 0999307 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118911 A

Priority

DE 19850937 A

Abstract (en)

At least one ring road is provided around the periphery of the conurbation. Within the ring road and connected to it, a number of road tunnels are provided at regular intervals beneath the supply and sewerage systems of the conurbation. Several underground car parks are provided above the road tunnels, and access is provided to the surface for people and goods. The ring road may also be underground.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Straßentunnelanordnung zur Verkehrserschließung von Ballungsräumen. Die oberirdische und unterirdische, in Tunnel geführte, Anordnung von Straßen in Ballungsräumen wird dem zunehmenden Verkehrswachstum in Großstädten nicht gerecht. Die Aufgabe, ein Konzept zur Lösung des Verkehrsproblems von Ballungsräumen zu entfernen wird dadurch gelöst, daß mindestens eine entlang der Peripherie des Ballungsraumes angeordnete Ringstraße und eine Vielzahl von innerhalb dieser Ringstraße in regelmäßigen Abständen angeordneten, in einer Tiefe unterhalb der Ver- und Entsorgungssysteme des Ballungsraumes verlaufenden Tunnelröhren vorgesehen sind sowie einer Vielzahl unterirdischer, über die Tunnelröhren erschlossener Parkgaragen mit Zugangsvorrichtungen zur Oberfläche des Ballungsraumes. In vorteilhaften Ausgestaltungen sind die Tunnels entweder als Ringtunnels oder als Serien parallel zueinander verlaufender, im Winkel zueinander und in verschiedenen Höhen unterhalb des Erdbodens angeordneter Tunnels ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 1/00 (2006.01); E01C 1/04 (2006.01); E21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999307 A2 20000510; EP 0999307 A3 20011121; EP 0999307 B1 20040506; BR 9905148 A 20010320; DE 19850937 C1 20000713; JP 2000144607 A 20000526; JP 3254196 B2 20020204; US 6312187 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030526

2002-09-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2002-09-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH LI

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011229

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI