Global patent index - EP 0999313 A2

EP 0999313 A2 2000-05-10 - Partition system for offices

Title (en)

Partition system for offices

Title (de)

Trennwand-Anordnung für Büroräume

Title (fr)

Systême de cloison pour bureaux

Publication

EP 0999313 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120662 A

Priority

DE 29819593 U

Abstract (en)

The partition arrangement has at least one support profile (1) for wall vertical support. At least one row of ratchet hooks (9,13,14) is along the longitudinal line (3) with openings (10,15,16) to be locked by the neighbouring wall unit. The hook unit has two mounting hooks, bonded together, each with a locking projection to engage a facing opening (10,15,16). The mounting hooks have clamp projections which can be moved by force by the bond between the hooks, to shift against each other.

Abstract (de)

Eine Trennwand-Anordnung (112), insbesondere für Büroräume, umfaßt mindestens ein Stützprofil (1) zur Vertikalabstützung der Trennwandanordnung (112) mit einer Längs-Richtung (3) und mindestens einer entlang der Längs-Richtung (3) verlaufenden Rast-Reihe (9, 13, 14) mit Rast-Öffnungen (10, 15, 16) zum Einrasten damit zu verbindender Gegenstände. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7422 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7466 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7487 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7488 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819593 U1 19990114; EP 0999313 A2 20000510; EP 0999313 A3 20010718; JP 2000144984 A 20000526; US 6332295 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040130

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE GB IT LI NL

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI NL

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI