Global Patent Index - EP 0999319 A1

EP 0999319 A1 2000-05-10 - Holding and locking device intended for an external blind or a sun protection awning

Title (en)

Holding and locking device intended for an external blind or a sun protection awning

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung und zum Verriegeln für aussen montierte Jalousien oder Sonnenschutzmarkisen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation et de verrouillage destine a un store extérieur ou une banne de protection solaire

Publication

EP 0999319 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98870242 A

Priority

EP 98870242 A

Abstract (en)

The lock for an exterior blind or sun shade has a casing (2) with a recessed passage (21) and a lock (5) inside the casing and having a roller (6) which engage against the recessed section in a first position. The lock has an exterior section is movable in a longitudinal groove in the casing , with a nose (51) to actuate a pin (9) to tilt the rollers into a locking position.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention se rapporte à un dispositif de verrouillage pour un store ou banne de protection solaire comportant une toile et une barre ou tringle sur laquelle s'exerce un effort de verrouillage par un ressort de pression lorsqu'elle arrive en fin de position de déroulement, caractérisé en ce que ce dispositif comporte un boîtier (2) pourvu à une extrémité d'un passage rétréci (21) et une pièce de verrouillage (5) constituée d'une partie interne logée dans le boîtier (2) pourvue d'un premier galet ou jeu de galets (6) venant buter contre la partie rétrécie dans une première position et d'un deuxième galet ou jeu de galets (7) engagé dans la partie rétrécie (21) et d'une partie extérieure mobile dans une fente longitudinale du boîtier (2) munie d'un bec (51), de manière qu'une broche (9), par son action sur le bec (51), fasse basculer la pièce de verrouillage (5) en entraînant le galet ou jeu de galets (6) dans la partie rétrécie (21) afin que le ressort de pression monté sur la pièce de verrouillage (5) tende et maintienne la toile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0644 (2013.01); E04F 10/0607 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999319 A1 20000510; EP 0999319 B1 20050126; AT 288004 T 20050215; DE 69828792 D1 20050303

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HAROL INTERNATIONAL N.V.

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-08-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-05-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050507

2005-04-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-04-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828792 P 20050303

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2004-12-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HOLDING AND LOCKING DEVICE INTENDED FOR AN EXTERNAL BLIND OR A SUN PROTECTION AWNING

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI