Global Patent Index - EP 0999323 A2

EP 0999323 A2 2000-05-10 - Handle for controlling an electric vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Handle for controlling an electric vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Handhabe für die Steuerung eines elektrischen Kraftfahrzeugsschlosses

Title (fr)

Poignée pour le contrôle d'une serrure de véhicule électrique

Publication

EP 0999323 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99121670 A

Priority

IT TO980924 A

Abstract (en)

A handle (1) for controlling an electric lock of a vehicle door has a supporting body (2) for fitment to the vehicle door; a control device (7) for manually activating the electric lock; and a casing (8) which fully houses the control device (7), is distinct from the supporting body (2), and is connected releasably to the supporting body (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 5/00; E05B 17/22; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01); H01H 3/16 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/10 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); H01H 3/163 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999323 A2 20000510; EP 0999323 A3 20000913; IT 1305153 B1 20010410; IT TO980924 A1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040406

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030924

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI