Global patent index - EP 0999331 A2

EP 0999331 A2 2000-05-10 - Method for applying spacers of thermoplastic material to insulating glazing units

Title (en)

Method for applying spacers of thermoplastic material to insulating glazing units

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Auftragen von Abstandhaltern für Isolierglasscheiben aus thermoplastischem Werkstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé d'application de cadres d'espacement en matériau thermoplastique aux vitrages isolants

Publication

EP 0999331 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890355 A

Priority

AT 184698 A

Abstract (en)

Temperature of the thermoplastic is measured at the coating point. Coating speed of the plastic along the edge is increased when this temperature rises above a set limit, and vice-versa. Preferred features: Coating pressure is held sensibly constant, over a given range of temperature departure from the desired value. Should the temperature become too low, pressure is increased and vice-versa. Temperature is also measured at a point spaced away from the coating point.

Abstract (de)

Beim Auftragen eines Abstandhalters aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff auf eine Glasscheibe beim Herstellen von Isolierglasscheiben wird der Kunststoff mit der gewünschten Querschnittsform entlang des Randes der Glasscheibe aufgespritzt. Die Geschwindigkeit, mit der Kunststoff entlang des Randes der Glasscheibe aufgetragen wird, wird in Abhängigkeit von der Temperatur des Kunststoffes gewählt. Dabei ist für einen vorgegebenen Sollwert der Temperatur eine Geschwindigkeit, mit der Kunststoff entlang des Randes der Glasscheibe aufgetragen wird, vorgegeben. Ändert sich die Temperatur nach oben, dann wird die Geschwindigkeit erhöht, wenn die Temperatur hingegen unter den Sollwert absinkt, wird die Geschwindigkeit, mit der Kunststoff entlang des Randes der Glasscheibe aufgetragen wird, verringert. So ist sichergestellt, daß immer die richtige Menge an thermoplastischem Kunststoff auf die Glasscheibe aufgespritzt wird und ein Abstandhalter mit gleichmäßiger Querschnittsform erhalten wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/673; B05C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/10 (2006.01); E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/6733 (2013.01); B05C 11/1007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999331 A2 20000510; EP 0999331 A3 20010816; AT 406788 B 20000925; AT A184698 A 20000115; US 6491966 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040629

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI