Global Patent Index - EP 0999342 A2

EP 0999342 A2 2000-05-10 - Method and apparatus for controlling actuation of a tool within a subterranean wellbore

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling actuation of a tool within a subterranean wellbore

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung um die Betätigung eines Werkzeugs in einem unterirdischen Bohrloch zu kontrollieren

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour contrôler l'actionnement d'un outil dans un puits

Publication

EP 0999342 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308564 A

Priority

US 18452698 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus and corresponding methods are disclosed for controlling fluid flow within a subterranean well (12c). A well control system is remotely controllable by transmission of a signal to an actuator (76) interconnected in a tubular string (28c) in the well (12c). The actuator (76) includes a receiver (72) for receiving the signal, a pump (62c) and an electrical power source. When the signal is received by the receiver (72), the pump (62c) is operatively coupled to the power source and the pump (62c) delivers pressurized fluid to operate a well tool, such as a packer (30c,32c,34c) or valve (36c,38c,40c). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 33/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999342 A2 20000510; EP 0999342 A3 20021204; AU 5601999 A 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040720

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040308

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 33/127 A, 7E 21B 23/06 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI