Global Patent Index - EP 0999348 A2

EP 0999348 A2 2000-05-10 - Fluid sample chamber with non-reactive lining

Title (en)

Fluid sample chamber with non-reactive lining

Title (de)

Flüssigkeits-Proben-Kammer mit nicht-reaktiver Auskleidung

Title (fr)

Chambre d'échantillonnage de liquides avec revêtement non-réactif

Publication

EP 0999348 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308659 A

Priority

  • US 10675298 P
  • US 35741699 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for retaining a well-fluid sample and a method for using the same. The apparatus comprises a variable volume sample chamber having interior surfaces of a nonreactive material, such as a ceramic, the interior surfaces defining a cavity (222). The sample chamber comprises a tubular member, a piston (226) slidingly engaged in the tubular member operable in response to fluid pressure within the sample chamber, a passageway (260) defined in the sample chamber and adapted for providing fluid communication between the cavity (222) and an area exterior the sample chamber, and a valve assembly (254) operable for selectively opening and closing the passageway (260). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 49/081 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999348 A2 20000510; EP 0999348 A3 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI