Global patent index - EP 0999349 A2

EP 0999349 A2 2000-05-10 - Axial turbine

Title (en)

Axial turbine

Title (de)

Axialturbine

Title (fr)

Turbine axiale

Publication

EP 0999349 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810971 A

Priority

DE 19850732 A

Abstract (en)

The axial turbine has a rotor (6) provided with a number of rotor blades (7), spaced axially from a jet ring (15) with a number of guide vanes (14) between inner and outer rings (12,13). The separation edge (17) provided between the outer ring (13) of the jet ring and the cover (8) around the outside of the rotor lies on the rotor blade side of the axial center plane (20) through the axial gap (18) between the rotor and the jet ring.

Abstract (de)

Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine Axialturbine mit einem verbesserten Wirkungsgrad zu schaffen. Zudem sollen die Montage- bzw. Demontagemöglichkeiten erweitert werden. Erfindungsgemäss wird dies dadurch erreicht, dass die Trennfuge (17) vom Aussenring (12) des Düsenringes (15) zur Abdeckung (8) laufschaufelseitig einer durch die halbe Spaltweite (19) des Axialspaltes (18) verlaufenden, gedachten Ebene (20) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/24; F01D 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 39/00 (2006.01); F01D 5/00 (2006.01); F01D 5/14 (2006.01); F01D 5/20 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01); F01D 9/04 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 9/02 (2013.01); F01D 5/145 (2013.01); F01D 5/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999349 A2 20000510; EP 0999349 A3 20020313; EP 0999349 B1 20050511; CN 1144935 C 20040407; CN 1253230 A 20000517; CN 2403896 Y 20001101; DE 19850732 A1 20000511; DE 59912034 D1 20050616; JP 2000145407 A 20000526; KR 100656721 B1 20061215; KR 20000035199 A 20000626; TW 460656 B 20011021; US 6318961 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912034

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020819

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI