Global Patent Index - EP 0999350 A1

EP 0999350 A1 2000-05-10 - Mechanism for generating control signals for driving an internal combustion engine, and internal combustion engine using the same

Title (en)

Mechanism for generating control signals for driving an internal combustion engine, and internal combustion engine using the same

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen von Steuersignalen für den Betrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine sowie Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif générateur de signaux de commande pour le fonctionnement d'un moteur à combustion interne et moteur à combustion interne utilisant un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 0999350 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810895 A

Priority

  • EP 99810895 A
  • EP 98811102 A

Abstract (en)

The generator produces electrical control signals. Sensors (43,43b) are provided with control elements (42a,b,c) which rotate together with the crankshaft, such that each sensor outputs a signal when the control element assigned to it is at a predetermined angular position. These output signals are used to produce electric control signals for operating the engine. A combustion engine is also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird eine Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen von Steuersignalen für den Betrieb einer elektrisch-hydraulisch gesteuerten und eine Kurbelwelle aufweisenden Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere eines Grossdieselmotors, bei welcher Brennkraftmaschine zumindest die Einspritzung und der Gaswechsel mittels Hydrauliksystemen gesteuert sind, wobei die Hydrauliksysteme Vorsteuereinheiten (30) umfassen, die mittels elektrischer Signale von einer Kontrolleinheit (9) derart betätigbar sind, dass sie die Hydrauliksysteme für die Einspritzung und den Gaswechsel steuern. Die Vorrichtung (40) umfasst mehrere Steuerelemente (42a, 42b, 42c), die so angeordnet sind, dass sie synchron mit der Kurbelwelle (2) rotieren. Die erzeugten Steuersignale sind elektrische Steuersignale. Es sind den Steuerelementen (42a, 42b, 42c) zugeordnete Sensoren (43, 43b) vorgesehen, die derart mit den Steuerelementen (42a, 42b, 42c) zusammenwirken, dass jeder Sensor (43, 43b) bei vorgegebenen Winkelpositionen des ihm zugeordneten Steuerelements (42a, 42b, 42c) ein Signal abgibt. Mittels dieser Signale sind die elektrischen Steuersignale für den Betrieb der Brennkraftmaschine erzeugbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2006.01); F01L 1/46 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2013.01); F01L 1/46 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999350 A1 20000510; EP 0999350 B1 20040609; CN 1109190 C 20030521; CN 1253231 A 20000517; DE 59909681 D1 20040715; DK 0999350 T3 20040719; JP 2000145529 A 20000526; KR 100679615 B1 20070207; KR 20000035229 A 20000626; PL 196585 B1 20080131; PL 336378 A1 20000508

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909681 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAERTSILAE SCHWEIZ AG

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI