Global Patent Index - EP 0999355 A3

EP 0999355 A3 2001-03-28 - Fuel injector having extended voltage range

Title (en)

Fuel injector having extended voltage range

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil mit erweitertem Spannungsbereich

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de carburant à plage de tension étendue

Publication

EP 0999355 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99121154 A

Priority

  • US 10676098 P
  • US 20642198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999355A2] A fuel injector apparatus includes an electromagnetic fuel injector having a housing and a magnetic circuit in the housing. The magnetic circuit including an electromagnetic coil constructed and arranged to operate at a nominal voltage to open the fuel injector. The nominal voltage is substantially less that a supply voltage. Circuit structure is electrically coupled with the coil and is constructed and arranged to step-down the supply voltage to be substantially the nominal voltage at the coil. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2051 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999355 A2 20000510; EP 0999355 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021108

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI