Global patent index - EP 0999367 A1

EP 0999367 A1 2000-05-10 - Flow conduit with cross-section discontinuity

Title (en)

Flow conduit with cross-section discontinuity

Title (de)

Strömungskanal mit Querschnittssprung

Title (fr)

Conduit d'écoulement à discontinuité de section transversale

Publication

EP 0999367 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811112 A

Priority

EP 98811112 A

Abstract (en)

The heat generator has vortex producing elements (20) arranged upstream of a step (10) in the wall (8) of a flow channel. The vortex producing elements are spaced apart with a lateral pitch along a line lying transverse to the main flow direction. The lateral pitch is smaller than half a wavelength corresponding to a limit frequency in the main flow upstream of the step, to destroy coherent periodic vortices released at a frequency below the limit frequency.

Abstract (de)

In Wärmeerzeugern und Brennern ist es häufig notwendig, unstetige Querschnittserweiterungen eines Strömungskanals zu realisieren. Die Strömung (U) bildet beim Überströmen der in der Wand (8) des Strömungskanals gebildeten Stufe (10) lateral kohärente Ablösewirbel, die sich nahezu ungedämpft stromab der Stufe fortsetzen, und häufig die Ursache für thermoakustische Schwingungen hoher Amplitude darstellen. Erfindungagemäss werden seine Strecke (s) stromauf der Stufe (10) wirbelerzeugende Elemente (20) mit einem lateralen Teilungsmass (t) auf einer quer zur Hauptströmung (U) verlaufenden Linie angeordnet. Bei einer zweckmässigen Wahl der Teilungsverhältnisses (t) wird die laterale Kohärenz der Ablösewirbel nachhaltig gestört. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/18 (2006.01); F15D 1/06 (2006.01); F17D 1/20 (2006.01); F23R 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15D 1/0045 (2013.01); F15D 1/06 (2013.01); F23R 3/045 (2013.01); F23D 2209/20 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00014 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0745809 A1 19961204 - ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999367 A1 20000510; EP 0999367 B1 20030212; CN 1124442 C 20031015; CN 1254073 A 20000524; DE 59807195 D1 20030320; JP 2000146184 A 20000526; JP 4426034 B2 20100303; US 6216644 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59807195

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59807195

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59807195

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59807195

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59807195

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59807195

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807195

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI