Global patent index - EP 0999401 A2

EP 0999401 A2 2000-05-10 - Tapping head

Title (en)

Tapping head

Title (de)

Abfüllkopf

Title (fr)

Tête de soutirage

Publication

EP 0999401 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120373 A

Priority

DE 19850913 A

Abstract (en)

The device is a probe for determining the actual degree of filling. The probe is carried by the mirror of the liquefied gas. The probe has a permanent magnet which operates together with a spacial fixed Reed-contact (1) for controlling the switching device on reaching the required degree of filling. The apparatus for processing filling cooled liquefied gas comprises a fixed filling head on or in the container. The filling head has a closable filling pipe (5) for the liquefied gas and a level measuring device (1,2,3,4,7,9). The level measuring device (1,2,3,4,7,9) has an extending device in the inner container for determining the actual degree of filling and together with a switch to interrupt the filling process on reaching the required degree of filling.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Abfüllen von tiefkalten verflüssigten Gasen, insbesondere verflüssigtem Stickstoff, in einen Behälter, insbesondere einen Kryobehälter, bestehend aus einem auf oder an dem Behälter befestigbaren Abfüllkopf, welcher eine abschaltbare Fülleitung (5) für das verflüssigte Gas und eine Füllstandsmeßeinrichtung (1, 2, 3, 4, 7, 9) aufweist, wobei die Füllstandsmeßeinrichtung ein sich mindestens teilweise in das Behälterinnere erstreckendes Mittel zur Erfassung des aktuellen Befüllungsgrades aufweist und mit Abschaltmitteln zur Unterbrechung des Abfüllvorganges beim Erreichen des gewünschten Endbefüllungsgrades zusammenwirkt. Zur Verbesserung der Vorrichtung hinsichtlich ihrer Störanfälligkeit wird vorgeschlagen, daß das Mittel zur Erfassung des aktuellen Befüllungsgrades durch einen vom Spiegel des verflüssigten Gases getragenen Meßfühler (7) gebildet ist, welcher ein Betätigungsorgan (4) aufweist, das mit einem räumlich fixierbaren Endwertgeber (1) für die Ansteuerung der Abschaltmittel beim Erreichen des gewünschten Endbefüllungsgrades zusammenwirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 6/00; F17C 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 5/02 (2006.01); F17C 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/021 (2013.01); F17C 5/02 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0413 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999401 A2 20000510; EP 0999401 A3 20010328; CN 1253254 A 20000517; DE 19850913 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 17C 6/00 A, 7F 17C 13/02 B, 7F 17C 5/02 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI