Global Patent Index - EP 0999401 A3

EP 0999401 A3 2001-03-28 - Tapping head

Title (en)

Tapping head

Title (de)

Abfüllkopf

Title (fr)

Tête de soutirage

Publication

EP 0999401 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120373 A

Priority

DE 19850913 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0999401A2] The device is a probe for determining the actual degree of filling. The probe is carried by the mirror of the liquefied gas. The probe has a permanent magnet which operates together with a spacial fixed Reed-contact (1) for controlling the switching device on reaching the required degree of filling. The apparatus for processing filling cooled liquefied gas comprises a fixed filling head on or in the container. The filling head has a closable filling pipe (5) for the liquefied gas and a level measuring device (1,2,3,4,7,9). The level measuring device (1,2,3,4,7,9) has an extending device in the inner container for determining the actual degree of filling and together with a switch to interrupt the filling process on reaching the required degree of filling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 6/00; F17C 13/02; F17C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 5/02 (2006.01); F17C 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/021 (2013.01); F17C 5/02 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0413 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999401 A2 20000510; EP 0999401 A3 20010328; CN 1253254 A 20000517; DE 19850913 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 17C 6/00 A, 7F 17C 13/02 B, 7F 17C 5/02 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI