Global Patent Index - EP 0999406 A2

EP 0999406 A2 2000-05-10 - Optical means for vehicle - preferably motor vehicle - lamps

Title (en)

Optical means for vehicle - preferably motor vehicle - lamps

Title (de)

Leuchtenoptik für Leuchten von Fahrzeugen, vorzugsweise von Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Moyens optiques pour lampes de véhicules, de préférence de véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0999406 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119796 A

Priority

DE 19851374 A

Abstract (en)

The optical lens (5) has at least one refractive lens element (11) positioned in the light path of a light source, provided with at least one opening (12) for free passage of the light rays. The refractive lens element (11) is provided by a Fresnel lens, with the opening (12) in the lens element positioned at an angle to the main beam direction of the light source, provided by an incandescent bulb or a LED.

Abstract (de)

Die Leuchtenoptik (5) hat ein lichtbrechendes Linsenelement (11), das im Strahlweg eines Leuchtmittels (3) liegt. Für Kraftfahrzeugleuchten werden hinsichtlich ihrer Lichtstärke überdimensionale Leuchtmittel (3) verwendet, um die gesetzlich vorgeschriebene Lichtintentsität in vorgeschriebenem Winkel zu erfüllen. Um die Leuchtenoptik (5) so auszubilden, daß die gesetzlich vorgeschriebene Kennlinie für eine Leuchte ohne hinsichtlich der Lichtstärke überdimensionierte Leuchtmittel (3) erreicht werden kann, weist das Linsenelement (11) eine Durchbrechung (12) auf, durch die ein Teil der vom Leuchtmittel (3) ausgesandten Strahlen ungebrochen hindurchgeht. Dadurch kann die vorgeschriebene winkelabhängige Lichtstärke zuverlässig erreicht werden. Die Wärmeentwicklung wird dadurch gering gehalten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/2212 (2013.01); F21S 48/215 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0999406 A2 20000510; EP 0999406 A3 20010725; DE 19851374 A1 20000525; DE 19851374 C2 20010621; US 6305830 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2002-04-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7F 21W 101/12 B, 7F 21W 101:12 Z

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI